SCOTT v. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP
Plaintiff: NIKO SCOTT
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHGROUP
Case Number: 1:2019cv03920
Filed: September 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Litigation (Dkt. #8 ). The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said request and finds that: 1) Plaintiff's claims shall besubmitted to arbitration; and 2) all litigation in this matter is STAYED pending completion of the arbitration process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/6/2019. (SWM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Litigation, filed by Defendant UNITEDHEALTH GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ARB Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mosby, Brian) Modified on 11/6/2019 (JDH).
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITEDHEALTH GROUP. (Mosby, Brian)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendant UNITEDHEALTH GROUP. (Mosby, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED HEALTHGROUP. (AKH)
September 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Macey on behalf of Plaintiff Niko Scott. (Macey, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC., filed by Niko Scott. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5629355) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Macey, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKO SCOTT
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHGROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?