YANANTA v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Case Number: 1:2019cv03928
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 91 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-01259. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: The R&R ( #88 ) is APPROVED AND ADOPTED; Plaintiff's Affidavit ( #89 ), construed as an Objection, is OVERRULED; and this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/16/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 89 INTERNATIONAL FSIA IMMUNE TRIBAL STATE AFFIDAVIT IN RESPONSE TO #88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/20/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 87 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT re #83 Order to Show Cause by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Rebecca L. Loeffler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/13/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, Cameron Yates. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel)(Findley, Bryan) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Bryan R. Findley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk on 6/6/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Because it appears that a substantial part of the acts or omissions giving rise to Yananta's claims occurred in the Southern District of Indiana, Yananta is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by June 27, 2019, why the Magistrate Judge should not recommend that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/6/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 82 RECEIPT #34675055069 in the amount of $100 re #81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bryan R. Findley. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
June 4, 2019 IN State Bar status verified as active for Bryan R. Findley. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 81 First MOTION for attorney Bryan R. Findley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, Cameron Yates. (Jordan, Dawn) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (gb). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Schedule Initial Case Management Conference, Judicial Settlement Conferences, Selection of Jury of Status Peers, Trial Date Order by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE to Motion re #77 First MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Court to Issue an Order for All Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaint by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 77 First MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion by Annie Alonso, Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Ford Goble, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, Charles King, John R. Layton, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Marion County Public Defenders Office, Marion County Sheriff's Office, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, Travis Shields, Cameron Yates. (Willfond, Adam) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY to RESPONSE in Support re #62 MOTION for Leave to AMEND PRO-SE RESPONSE TO FILE FORMAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING / RULE 12 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Chastain, Parks) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (gb). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #70 Motion for R. Eric Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court, Vicki Kinkade on 4/15/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF CORRECTION by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta re #73 Response in Opposition to Motion. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Leave to AMEND PRO-SE RESPONSE TO FILE FORMAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING / RULE 12 MOTION filed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 9, 2019 IN State Bar status verified as active for R. Eric Sanders. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: The relief requested in this motion #64 is fully addressed by the Court's recent order staying all briefing on Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. (Doc. No. #71 .) It is therefore FOUND MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on April 8, 2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (AN) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Because no scheduling order has been entered in this case and discovery has not formally commenced and because the Court must assure itself of its jurisdiction before addressing the merits of any action the defendants' motions ( #67 , #69 ) are GRANTED. Briefing of the motion for summary judgment is STAYED pending resolution of the motions to dismiss and entry of a scheduling order in this case. A new briefing schedule will be entered with that order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/8/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb) Modified text on 4/10/2019 (gb). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION for attorney R. Eric Sanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2886879) by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Ferrell, E.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 69 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Miller, Cory) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Discontinuance ( #54 ) in regard to defendants, The City of Indianapolis, The State of Indiana and Judge Mark D. Stoner. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice against these defendants. Claims against the remaining defendants are still pending. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/5/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Stay (Government Defendants) by Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana, Mark D. Stoner, Cameron Yates. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Loeffler, Rebecca) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) filed by Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana, Mark D. Stoner, Cameron Yates. (Loeffler, Rebecca) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 29, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Parks T. Chastain, E. Jason Ferrell and Cory Richard Miller. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 65 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Member Information)(Chastain, Parks) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay DISPOSITIVE MOTION BRIEFING & RULING by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order to Stay Dispositive Briefing & Ruling)(Chastain, Parks) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support of #62 MOTION for Leave to AMEND PRO-SE RESPONSE TO FILE FORMAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING / RULE 12 MOTION filed by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Chastain, Parks) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to AMEND PRO-SE RESPONSE TO FILE FORMAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING / RULE 12 MOTION by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1 of 2 - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A 2 of 2 - Mem Supp Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Answer to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Teresa Woods, #5 Attachment Cunningham v. Sunshine Consulting, #6 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion to Leave)(Chastain, Parks) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Richard Miller on behalf of Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service (Miller, Cory) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Jason Ferrell on behalf of Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service (Ferrell, E.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Parks T. Chastain on behalf of Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service (Chastain, Parks) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Supportive Facts in Support of #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) filed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 55 EX-PARTE MOTION FOR REISSUE by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT OF SUPPORTIVE FACTS IN SUPPORT OF #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) filed by Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana, Mark D. Stoner, Cameron Yates. (Loeffler, Rebecca) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) by Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana, Mark D. Stoner, Cameron Yates. (Loeffler, Rebecca) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Loeffler on behalf of Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Mark D. Stoner, Cameron Yates (Loeffler, Rebecca) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya J. Austin on behalf of Annie Alonso, Charles King, John R. Layton, Marion County Public Defenders Office, Marion County Sheriff's Office, Travis Shields (Austin, Tonya) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Willfond on behalf of Annie Alonso, Charles King, John R. Layton, Marion County Public Defenders Office, Marion County Sheriff's Office, Travis Shields (Willfond, Adam) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 46 Response to Summons by Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service.(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 45 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Mark D. Stoner served on 2/20/2019. (per USPO certified tracking) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 44 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Travis Shields served on 2/19/2019. (per USPO certified tracking) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Linda Major served on 2/19/2019. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Amy Foxworth served on 2/19/2019. (per USPO certified tracking) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Cameron Yates served on 2/19/2019. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Charles King served on 2/19/2019. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Nokwakhe Fuyana served on 2/19/2019. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Woods Bail Bond Service served on 2/19/2019. (per USPO certified tracking) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. John R. Layton served on 2/19/2019. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Annie Alonso served on 2/19/2019. (per USPO certified tracking) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez and State of Indiana answers due 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/19/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #31 Amended Complaint,, by Indiana Department of Child Services, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Loeffler, Rebecca) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 33 Summons issued as to Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Indiana Department of Child Services, Charles King, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Marion County Public Defenders Office, Marion County Sheriff's Office, Travis Shields, Mark D. Stoner, Theresa Woods. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Annie Alonso, City of Indianapolis, Department of Children Services, Amy Foxworth, Nokwakhe Fuyana, Ford Goble, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, Charles King, John R. Layton, Linda Major, Marion County Prosecutor's Office, Marion County Public Defenders Office, Marion County Sheriff's Office, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, Travis Shields, State of Indiana, Mark D. Stoner, Theresa Woods, Woods Bail Bond Service, filed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Because Yananta does not need the Court's permission to amend his complaint, his motion to amend ( #24 ) is FOUND MOOT. If Yananta still seeks to amend his complaint, he may do so without leave by filing a motion and a proposed amended complaint within twenty-one days of the date on which he was served with Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/28/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #17 & #21 Motion for Rebecca Loeffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court, Vicki Kinkade on 1/28/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) Modified on 1/28/2019 (vk). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana. (Goolsby, Jeremey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana. (Goolsby, Jeremey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Goolsby, Jeremey) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 25 RECEIPT #34675053410 in the amount of $100 re #21 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motions to appear pro hac vice ( #16 and #22 ) of Adam S. Willfond are GRANTED. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 1/8/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MOTION re #16 MOTION for attorney(s) Adam S. Willfond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2820893) by City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Adam S. Willfond, #3 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Austin, Tonya) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for attorney(s) Rebecca Loeffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Indiana Department of Child Services, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Jordan, Dawn) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/4/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 4, 2019 NOTE TO FILER re: DE #17 . This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word of WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 4, 2019 IN State Bar status verified as active for Adam S. Willfond and Rebecca L. Loeffler. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 4, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: #16 & #17 MOTIONS for attorneys Adam S. Willfond & Rebecca L. Loeffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice: These motions do not comply with the Court's local rules because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against counsel. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than three (3) business days from the date of entry of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Indiana Department of Child Services, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, State of Indiana. (Jordan, Dawn) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: To the extent the Notice #15 can be construed as a Motion, it is DENIED. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge in accordance with the Order of referral for further pretrial proceedings, and to issue Report and Recommendations on dispositive motions, if necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/26/18. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney(s) Rebecca L. Loeffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by State of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jordan, Dawn) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney(s) Adam S. Willfond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2820893) by City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Austin, Tonya) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Non-Consent to Jurisdiction Transfer or Assignment to Magistrate Judge by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due 1/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/18/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 18, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Tonya J. Austin and Jeremey R. Goolsby. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan. (Austin, Tonya) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya J. Austin on behalf of City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, M. Morgan (Austin, Tonya) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Supporting Documents for my Civil Rights Claim by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Shirley Perez served on 12/7/2018 per USPS Website. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. Kamary Nunn served on 12/7/2018 per USPS Website. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. M. Morgan served on 12/3/2018. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE regarding #3 Notice of Consent by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to City of Indianapolis, Ford Goble, M. Morgan, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez and State of Indiana. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the magistrate judge to oversee service of process on the defendants, to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions. Because he has now paid in full the $400.00 filing fee ( #4 ), Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ( #2 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/21/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIPT #34675052612 in the amount of $400 posted by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta re #1 Complaint. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta. (am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2018: #1 Attachment - Affidavit of Exempt of Filing Fee Status) (am). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Indianapolis, Indiana Department of Child Services, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, State of Indiana, Kamary Nunn, Shirley Perez, Ford Goble, M. Morgan filed by Isi Chito Lusa Yananta.(am) Modified Text on 11/29/2018 (am). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YANANTA v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?