CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. NOVEMBAL USA INC.
Plaintiff: CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC. and CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL INC.
Defendant: NOVEMBAL USA INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03944
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Appendix Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - '442 Patent, #4 Exhibit 2 - '171 Patent, #5 Exhibit 3 - Edie Assignment Agreement, #6 Exhibit 4 - Moll Assignment Agreement, #7 Exhibit 5 - Benecke Assignment Agreement, #8 Exhibit 6 -CSI Drawing, #9 Exhibit 7 - Email to Nestle, #10 Exhibit 8 -CSI Presentation, #11 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Novembal, #12 Exhibit 10 - Letter from CSI, #13 Exhibit 11 - Letter from Counsel to CSI, #14 Exhibit 12 - Email String, #15 Exhibit 13 - Email from Counsel, #16 Exhibit 14 - Novembal Drawing) (JDH)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel H. Shulman for CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/19/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David L. Bernard for CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/19/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Submission of Exhibit A Bernard Certification to the Motion for David L. Bernard to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Document #4), filed by Plaintiff CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Barron, Jeff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds Group Holdings, Inc. for CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC... (Barron, Jeff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel H. Shulman to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5634513), filed by Plaintiff CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barron, Jeff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) David L. Bernard to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5634500), filed by Plaintiff CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barron, Jeff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff M. Barron on behalf of Plaintiff CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Barron, Jeff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Barron, Jeff)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NOVEMBAL USA INC., filed by CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5634432) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '442 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '171 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - Edie Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Moll Assignment Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Benecke Assignment Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 -CSI Drawing, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email to Nestle, #8 Exhibit 8 -CSI Presentation, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Novembal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter from CSI, #11 Exhibit 11 - Letter from Counsel to CSI, #12 Exhibit 12 - Email String, #13 Exhibit 13 - Email from Counsel, #14 Exhibit 14 - Novembal Drawing, #15 Appendix Table of Exhibits)(Barron, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. NOVEMBAL USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVEMBAL USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Jeff M. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLOSURE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: Jeff M. Barron
Represented By: David L. Bernard
Represented By: Daniel H. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?