TOOLEY v. DDC HOTELS, INC.
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Defendant: DDC HOTELS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03963
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. DDC HOTELS, INC. served on 9/23/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DDC HOTELS, INC. (REO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DDC HOTELS, INC., filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5637507) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOLEY v. DDC HOTELS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Represented By: Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDC HOTELS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?