COOK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Plaintiff: KAREN COOK
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv03991
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 12/11/2019 re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Copy to Matthew L. Foutty via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/14/2019. (SWM)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 12/11/2019 re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff KAREN COOK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on MET)(Laker, Kurt)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File; The United States of America, through its Department of Housing and Urban Development, is afforded to and including October 21, 2019, to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/21/2019. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Shields, Gina)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Shields, Gina)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of state court records from Johnson Superior Court, Case No. 41D01-1908-PL-000108. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt V. Laker on behalf of Plaintiff KAREN COOK. (Laker, Kurt)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 21, 2019 in which to #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Shields, Gina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson Superior Court 1, case number 41D01-1908-PL-000108, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Summons, Appearance, Complaint, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Service Returned), #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Gina) Modified on 9/24/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN COOK
Represented By: Maura E. Binder
Represented By: David M. Johnson
Represented By: Alan Wayne McEwan
Represented By: Jessica S. Owens
Represented By: Matthew L. Foutty
Represented By: Kurt V. Laker
Represented By: Tina Michelle Caylor
Represented By: S. Brent Potter
Represented By: Craig Douglas Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA THROUGH ITS DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?