UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $30,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $30,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Claimant: ASIA MALONE and DENEICE ANDERSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv04057
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by DENEICE ANDERSON, ASIA MALONE.(NAD)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Claimants' #6 Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel. The court also notifies Ms. Anderson and Ms. Malone that she must ensure that the court (and the government) has a current address to which filings and court orders can be sent and a current telephone number and/or email by which she can be contacted on short notice. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/12/2019. (SWM)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Lack of Representation: Claimant Deneice Anderson has filed a notice (Dkt. #5 ) that an attorney she and claimant Asia Malone had hired to represent their interests with respect to the $30,500.00 United States currency no longer represents them. The court acknowledges that Ms. Anderson and Ms. Malone are not currently represented by counsel, and it encourages them to use their best efforts to find new counsel. The court directs the Clerk to show that the notice at Dkt. 5 has been considered by the court. The court also directs the Clerk to add Ms. Anderson and Ms. Malone to the docket as claimants. Copy to Deneice Anderson and Asia Malone via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/12/2019. (SWM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Verified Claim of Asia Malone. (DWH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Verified Claim of Deneice Anderson. (DWH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Deneice Anderson and Asia Malone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Election of Proceedings - CAFRA FORM)(DWH) Modified on 10/31/2019 (DWH).
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 *** NOTICE CONSIDERED BY THE COURT per Order dated 11/12/2019 (Dkt. #9 ) *** MOTION to Recognize Withdrawal Attorney, filed by Deneice Anderson and Asia Malone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Letter dated October 29, 2019 from Attorney Timothy J. Burns)(DWH) Modified on 11/13/2019 (SWM).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by Laura A. Briggs, Clerk on 10/3/2019. Electronic notice to USM-C.(DWH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Parker Babbs on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Babbs, Eric)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE IN REM against $30,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Babbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $30,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,500.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ASIA MALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: DENEICE ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?