QUALLS-HOLSTON v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: Daneal Qualls-Holston
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY and Deborah Stombaugh
Case Number: 1:2019cv04068
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/6/2019.(JRB)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (Terrell, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Marie Knear on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (Knear, Erica)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Macchia on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (Macchia, Melissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. A. Dawson on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (Dawson, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Terrell on behalf of Defendants INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (Terrell, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (CKM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY, DEBORAH STOMBAUGH. (Waterfill, Mark)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Waterfill on behalf of Plaintiff Daneal Qualls-Holston. (Waterfill, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff Daneal Qualls-Holston. (Waterfill, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5651959) (Waterfill, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUALLS-HOLSTON v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Erica Marie Knear
Represented By: Melissa A. Macchia
Represented By: Michael C. Terrell
Represented By: James R. A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Stombaugh
Represented By: Erica Marie Knear
Represented By: Melissa A. Macchia
Represented By: Michael C. Terrell
Represented By: James R. A. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daneal Qualls-Holston
Represented By: Mark R. Waterfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?