DEAN POTTER LLC v. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Plaintiff: DEAN POTTER LLC
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv04085
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 First MOTION to Transfer Case (Or, In the Alternative, Dismiss) , filed by Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Pendexter, Andrew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Transfer Case (Or, In the Alternative, Dismiss), filed by Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Morgan Smith (and accompanying exhibits), #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michelle Fernandez, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pendexter, Andrew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent LG ELECTRONICS, INC., Other Affiliate LG Corporation for LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC... (Pendexter, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. Copy Mailed. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/18/2019.(MGG)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Morgan E. Smith for LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-2(a), within 7 days. Copy to Morgan E. Smith via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/15/2019. (SWM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Morgan E. Smith to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5717548), filed by Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Morgan Smith in Support of PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV)(Denton, Duane)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mark Sommers for LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-2(a), within 7 days. Copy to Mark Sommers via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/1/2019. (SWM)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Naresh Kilaru for LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-2(a), within 7 days. Copy to Naresh Kilaru via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/1/2019. (SWM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark Sommers to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5702945), filed by Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Mark Sommers in Support of Motion to Appear PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Denton, Duane)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Naresh Kilaru to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5702871), filed by Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Naresh Kilaru In Support of Motion to Appear PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Denton, Duane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Pendexter on behalf of Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Pendexter, Andrew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Lynn Clark on behalf of Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Clark, Briana)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Denton, Duane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Denton on behalf of Defendant LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.. (Denton, Duane)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by DEAN POTTER LLC. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. served on 10/9/2019. (Tehranian, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John Tehranian hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Tehranian, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC. (REO)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Tehranian on behalf of Plaintiff DEAN POTTER LLC. (Tehranian, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEAN POTTER LLC. (Tehranian, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC., filed by DEAN POTTER LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5656643) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Tehranian, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEAN POTTER LLC v. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Represented By: Morgan E. Smith
Represented By: Andrew M. Pendexter
Represented By: Naresh Kilaru
Represented By: Mark S. Sommers
Represented By: Duane R. Denton
Represented By: Briana Lynn Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN POTTER LLC
Represented By: John Tehranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?