FULKERSON v. ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: VICKI FULKERSON
Defendant: ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC. and AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04095
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a)(1)(B) AND S.D. IND. L.R. 7-1(C)(2) against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Phelps, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 34 Exhibit List , Initial, filed by Plaintiff VICKI FULKERSON. (Phelps, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 Witness List , Initial, filed by Plaintiff VICKI FULKERSON. (Phelps, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2021 10:30 AM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 09:00 AM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. The court has allotted five days for this trial. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/21/2019.(JRB)
November 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendant ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.. (Moore, J.)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER STRIKING INITIAL DISCLOSURE: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(1) and Local Rule 26-2 prohibit the filing of discovery materials except when filed in relation to a motion under Fed R. Civ P. 26(c) or 37, in anticipation of use at trial or on appeal, or in response to a court order. Instead, routine discovery must be served on opposing parties using a method described under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2). The only document that may be filed would be a "Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure". Counsel for Defendant ASDM Beverly Hills, Inc. filed its actual disclosures. Therefore, the Court STRIKES Defendant ASDM Beverly Hills, Inc.'s Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures. [Dkt. 27.] The Clerk is directed to show Docket No. 27 as stricken from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/20/2019.(SWM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures Rule 26(a), filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (DeVries, Edward)
November 18, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1), filed by Plaintiff VICKI FULKERSON. (Phelps, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 27 *** STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 11/20/2019 (Dkt. #30 ) *** NOTICE : Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures, filed by Defendant ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC. (Moore, J.) Modified on 11/20/2019 (SWM).
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC..(Esenwein, Jill)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2020. Discovery due by 10/2/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/12/2019. (GD)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/8/2019.(SWM)
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (DeVries, Edward)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (DeVries, Edward)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 AGREED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. . (DeVries, Edward)
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal (Count Four Against Amazon.com ONLY), filed by Plaintiff VICKI FULKERSON (Phelps, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 Jurisdictional Statement Pursuant to LR 81-1, re #1 Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Phelps, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.. (Esenwein, Jill)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 Submission of State Court Record from Johnson County in case number 41D04-1909-CT-000131. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.(LAB) (JRB)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before November 6, 2019. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Orde for established deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/9/2019.(SWM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Richard Moore on behalf of Defendant ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.. (Moore, J.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.. (Esenwein, Jill)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Esenwein on behalf of Defendant ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.. (Esenwein, Jill)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (DeVries, Edward)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Phelps on behalf of Plaintiff VICKI FULKERSON. (Phelps, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. DeVries on behalf of Defendant AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (DeVries, Edward)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (DeVries, Edward)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.. (LAB) (JRB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR*** NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (JRB) Modified on 10/2/2019 (JRB).
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. DeVries on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (DeVries, Edward)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson Superior Court Indiana, case number 41D04-1909-CT-000131, filed by Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Filing Fee of $400, Receipt No. 0756-5659139) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DeVries, Edward) Modified on 10/2/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FULKERSON v. ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI FULKERSON
Represented By: Dean J. Arnold
Represented By: Michael W. Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASDM BEVERLY HILLS, INC.
Represented By: J. Richard Moore
Represented By: Jill Esenwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. DeVries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?