CRUMLEY v. FORESTALL et al
Plaintiff: Keith R Crumley
Defendant: Officer FOXWORTHY, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, Officer Khyree Jones, Lt. WILLIAM WEAVER, Nurse TERESA PIERCE, Captain Diedra D. Baker, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, Captain ROBERT FREDERICK, Deputy Chief TANESHA S. CREAR, Sheriff Kerry J. Forestall, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, Deputy JoAnna Sahm, TYLER BOUMA and Chief of Police BRYAN K. ROACH
Case Number: 1:2019cv04110
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by DIEDRA D. BAKER, TYLER BOUMA, TANESHA S. CREAR, KERRY J. FORESTALL, FOXWORTHY, ROBERT D. FREDERICK, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, KHYREE JONES, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, BRYAN K. ROACH, JOANNA SAHM.(Upchurch, Andrew)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - granting #22 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Andrew J. Upchurch's appearance on behalf of Defendant, Teresa Pierce, is WITHDRAWN and TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/25/2019. (NAD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendant TERESA PIERCE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Upchurch, Andrew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 Agreed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff KEITH R. CRUMLEY . (Gray, Nikki)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of Service by CMRRR by KEITH R. CRUMLEY. DIEDRA D. BAKER served on 10/9/2019; TYLER BOUMA served on 10/9/2019; TANESHA S. CREAR served on 10/11/2019; KERRY J. FORESTALL served on 10/9/2019; FOXWORTHY served on 10/9/2019; ROBERT D. FREDERICK served on 10/9/2019; INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 10/10/2019; KHYREE JONES served on 10/9/2019; MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE served on 10/10/2019; BRYAN K. ROACH served on 10/9/2019; JOANNA SAHM served on 10/9/2019; WILLIAM WEAVER served on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified mail receipts, #2 Exhibit executed proof of service, #3 Exhibit USPS tracking of certified mailing)(Gray, Nikki) Modified on 11/18/2019 - Edited docket text for administrative purposes. Added Defendants TERESA PIERCE and CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS also known as WELLPATH LLC as served on 10/9/2019 and 10/11/2019 respectively(NAD).
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 MEDICAL DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #1 Complaint FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, TERESA PIERCE.(Farrington, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Farrington on behalf of Defendants CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, TERESA PIERCE. (Farrington, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS identifying Corporate Parent CCS INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, LLC for CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS.. (Dillon, Carol)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by TERESA PIERCE. TERESA PIERCE waiver sent on 10/7/2019. (Dillon, Carol)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS waiver sent on 10/7/2019. (Dillon, Carol)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Dillon on behalf of Defendants CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, TERESA PIERCE. (Dillon, Carol)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2019 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/25/2019.(SWM)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants DIEDRA D. BAKER, TYLER BOUMA, TANESHA S. CREAR, KERRY J. FORESTALL, FOXWORTHY, ROBERT D. FREDERICK, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, KHYREE JONES, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, TERESA PIERCE, BRYAN K. ROACH, JOANNA SAHM, WILLIAM WEAVER. (Upchurch, Andrew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Upchurch on behalf of Defendants DIEDRA D. BAKER, TYLER BOUMA, TANESHA S. CREAR, KERRY J. FORESTALL, FOXWORTHY, ROBERT D. FREDERICK, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, KHYREE JONES, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, TERESA PIERCE, BRYAN K. ROACH, JOANNA SAHM, WILLIAM WEAVER. (Upchurch, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to TERESA PIERCE. (CKM)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to TERESA PIERCE. (Gray, Nikki)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Overholt on behalf of Defendants DIEDRA D. BAKER, TANESHA S. CREAR, KERRY J. FORESTALL, FOXWORTHY, ROBERT D. FREDERICK, JOANNA SAHM, WILLIAM WEAVER. (Overholt, Anthony)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. (NAD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin C. Schrock on behalf of Plaintiff KEITH R. CRUMLEY. (Schrock, Justin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. (Gray, Nikki)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DIEDRA D. BAKER, TYLER BOUMA, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, TANESHA S. CREAR, KERRY J. FORESTALL, FOXWORTHY, ROBERT D. FREDERICK, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, KHYREE JONES, TERESA PIERCE, BRYAN K. ROACH, JOANNA SAHM, WILLIAM WEAVER. (REO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikki G. Gray on behalf of Plaintiff Keith R Crumley. (Gray, Nikki)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5662867) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons , #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gray, Nikki) Modified on 10/7/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRUMLEY v. FORESTALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer FOXWORTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Khyree Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. WILLIAM WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse TERESA PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Diedra D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain ROBERT FREDERICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Chief TANESHA S. CREAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Kerry J. Forestall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy JoAnna Sahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER BOUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police BRYAN K. ROACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith R Crumley
Represented By: Nikki G. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?