ADAMS et al v. MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.
Plaintiff: JON MCNABB, ANNA HINDS, PAUL KENNEDY, JON ADAMS and HAROLD WIMS
Defendant: MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04112
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10 days after resolution of Motion for Partial Dismissal in which to #14 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , filed by Defendant MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement)(Prather, R.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , filed by Defendant MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Prather, R.)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Prather, R.)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/18/2019.(SWM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Prather, R.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Prather, R.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Anthony Prather on behalf of Defendant MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Prather, R.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Hunter on behalf of Defendant MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.. (Hunter, Taylor)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Henn on behalf of Plaintiffs JON ADAMS, ANNA HINDS, PAUL KENNEDY, JON MCNABB, HAROLD WIMS. (Henn, David)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by All Plaintiffs. MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC. served on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cummings, Paul)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC. (REO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiffs JON ADAMS, ANNA HINDS, PAUL KENNEDY, JON MCNABB, HAROLD WIMS. (Cummings, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5663095) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS et al v. MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON MCNABB
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Represented By: David M. Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA HINDS
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Represented By: David M. Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL KENNEDY
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Represented By: David M. Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON ADAMS
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Represented By: David M. Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD WIMS
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Represented By: David M. Henn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDCONTINENT INDEPENDENT SYSTEM OPERATOR, INC.
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?