SAYLOR v. ANGIE'S LIST
Plaintiff: LORI SAYLOR
Defendant: ANGIE'S LIST, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04214
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 0:19-cv-00548. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND OPINION granting #13 Motion to Transfer Case by Defendant Angie's List, Inc. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/11/2019.(mbro, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/26/2019.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by GAF Materials Corporation. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bercot, Ethan) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by William Alexander Coates for September 26, 2019 through September 30, 2019 (Coates, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT by Angie's List, Inc. to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alabama Supreme Court Opinion)(Lambert, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Angie's List, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Clayton)(Lambert, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case by William Alexander Coates on behalf of Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC (Coates, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Response filed by Lori Saylor.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/29/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Gambrell, Brian) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case by Angie's List, Inc. Response filed by GAF Materials Corporation.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/29/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Merson, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Mallory, Jennifer) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay deadlines pending resolution of the Motion to Transfer. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/10/2019.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Stay re #10 Scheduling Order,, #11 Mediation Order by Lori Saylor. Response to Motion due by 4/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Gambrell, Brian) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case Response to Motion due by 4/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/3/2019.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case by GAF Materials Corporation. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mallory, Jennifer) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Jonathan Bercot on behalf of GAF Materials Corporation (Bercot, Ethan) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case ( Response to Motion due by 4/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/29/2019.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Pursuant LR 12.01, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case ( Response to Motion due by 4/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Lori Saylor. No proposed order.(Gambrell, Brian) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER GAF Materials Corporation answer due 4/16/2019. (Mallory, Jennifer) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Mallory on behalf of GAF Materials Corporation (Mallory, Jennifer) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Angie's List, Inc..(Lambert, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angie's List, Inc..(Lambert, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case by Angie's List, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 4/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Stiegelmeyer)No proposed order.(Lambert, William) supplement #32 added on 5/17/2019 (asni, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/11/2019. (cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 4/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/13/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/10/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/9/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/9/2019, Discovery due by 9/9/2019, Motion in Limine due by 12/23/2019, Motions due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/6/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 1/13/2020, Mediation Due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/11/2019. (cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC.(Coates, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC.(Coates, William) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to GAF Materials Corporation. (cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC. (cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Angie's List, Inc. (cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kemp Custom Homes, Inc. (cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lori Saylor.(cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angie's List, Inc., GAF Materials Corporation, Kemp Custom Homes, Inc., Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8285862) filed by Lori Saylor. Service due by 5/23/2019(cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAYLOR v. ANGIE'S LIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGIE'S LIST, INC.
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI SAYLOR
Represented By: Brian C Gambrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?