NICASTRO v. JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: TONI NICASTRO
Defendant: ELLISE HAYDEN, JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C., BRIANNA HEAD and JWM NEUROLOGY, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04357
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES - This matter is set for a settlement conference at 9 a.m. on February 21, 2020, room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/20/2019.(MGG)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel December 19, 2019, for an initial pretrial conference. Dispositive Motions are due by October 30, 2020. Discovery shall be completed by August 25, 2020. By separate order, this case will be set for a settlement conference in Indianapolis at 9 a.m. on February 21, 2020, and conference must conclude no later than 11:45 a.m. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/20/2019.(MGG)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants ELLISE HAYDEN, BRIANNA HEAD, JWM NEUROLOGY, P.C. . (Stutzman, Dana)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Plaintiff moved the Court to continue the initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 12, 2019, and that motion #9 is granted. The initial pretrial is reset for 11:30 am on December 19, 2019, in Room 234. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/5/2019.(SWM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Submission of Continue Initial Pretrial Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff TONI NICASTRO. (Waterfill, Mark) Modified on 12/3/2019 (JDC).
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial, filed by Plaintiff TONI NICASTRO. (Waterfill, Mark)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed by All Defendants.(Stutzman, Dana)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for an initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on December 12, 2019, at 2 p.m. in Room 234, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/22/2019.(MGG)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ELLISE HAYDEN, BRIANNA HEAD, JWM NEUROLOGY, P.C.. (Kolisek, Jake)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELLISE HAYDEN, BRIANNA HEAD, JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C.. (Kolisek, Jake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake Kolisek on behalf of Defendants ELLISE HAYDEN, BRIANNA HEAD, JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C.. (Kolisek, Jake)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Eugene Stutzman on behalf of Defendants ELLISE HAYDEN, BRIANNA HEAD, JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C.. (Stutzman, Dana)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hendricks Superior Court 4, case number 32D04-1909-CT-000120, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5695449) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stutzman, Dana) Modified on 10/28/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICASTRO v. JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLISE HAYDEN
Represented By: Dana Eugene Stutzman
Represented By: Jake Kolisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPHSON WALLACK MUNSHOWER NEUROLOGY, P.C.
Represented By: Dana Eugene Stutzman
Represented By: Jake Kolisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIANNA HEAD
Represented By: Dana Eugene Stutzman
Represented By: Jake Kolisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWM NEUROLOGY, P.C.
Represented By: Dana Eugene Stutzman
Represented By: Jake Kolisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI NICASTRO
Represented By: Mark R. Waterfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?