CITYMOMS, INC. v. THECITYMOMS GREATER INDIANAPOLIS LLC
Plaintiff: CITYMOMS, INC.
Defendant: THECITYMOMS GREATER INDIANAPOLIS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04377
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 10/28/2019, #2 Exhibit 1, cease and desist letter including copy of trademark registration) (JDH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to THECITYMOMS GREATER INDIANAPOLIS LLC. (JDH)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to CITYMOMS, INC.. (Roberts, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John L. Roberts hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Roberts, John)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Roberts on behalf of Plaintiff CITYMOMS, INC.. (Roberts, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITYMOMS, INC.. (Roberts, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THECITYMOMS GREATER INDIANAPOLIS LLC, filed by CITYMOMS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5697790) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, cease and desist letter including copy of trademark registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Roberts, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITYMOMS, INC. v. THECITYMOMS GREATER INDIANAPOLIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THECITYMOMS GREATER INDIANAPOLIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITYMOMS, INC.
Represented By: John L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?