SHIRLEY v. PITTS et al
Plaintiff: HENRY SHIRLEY
Defendant: JASON DOUGLAS BUNCH, MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY and LAURA PITTS
Case Number: 1:2019cv04498
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Screening and Dismissing Complaint, and Directing Plaintiff to Show Cause. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seven Dollars and Seventy-Five Cents ($7.75). He shall have through January 22, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The complaint must be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). The plaintiff shall have through January 22, 2020, in which to either show cause why Judgment consistent with this Entry should not issue or file an amended complaint which cures the deficiencies discussed in this Entry. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/20/2019. (MAC)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff HENRY SHIRLEY. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Envelope)(JDC)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by HENRY SHIRLEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through December 12, 2019, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff HENRY SHIRLEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JASON DOUGLAS BUNCH, MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY, LAURA PITTS, filed by HENRY SHIRLEY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHIRLEY v. PITTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON DOUGLAS BUNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA PITTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY SHIRLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?