INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) LOCAL UNION NO. 20 v. ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20
Defendant: Rogers Mechanical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04622
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
2 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
3 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT #22 - Plaintiff, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20 (Local 20), having motioned to withdraw its Request to Enter Default; And, this Court being duly advised in the premises, now finds that Plaintiffs Motion should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs Motion is withdrawn #19 . Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/13/2020. (JDC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.. (LAB) (JDC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw #19 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) LOCAL UNION NO. 20. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gath, Neil)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Roger Mechanicals Motion to Strike (ECF No. 12) is denied. Petitioners Motion to Consolidate (ECF No. 13) is granted. All other pending motions in the miscellaneous action are denied as moot. The miscellaneous action Cause No. 1:19-mc-00068 is consolidated with Cause No. 1:19-cv-04622-JRS-DML. Rogers Mechanical is granted leave until January 31, 2020 to file a counterclaim in Cause No. 1:19-cv-04622-JRS-DML, seeking to vacate the LJABs decision, if it chooses to do so, in order to preserve any claims raised in the miscellaneous. The Clerk is directed to consolidate Cause No. 1:19-mc- 00068-JRS-DML with Cause No. 1:19-cv-04622-JRS-DML and close this case. No final judgment will issue in Cause No. 1:19-mc-00068-JRS-DML. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/10/2020.(JDC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim, filed by Defendant ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.. (Daugherty, Charles)
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #24 ***MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) LOCAL UNION NO. 20. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Neil E. Gath, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gath, Neil) Modified on 1/13/2020 (JDC).
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Direction in its Notice of Initial Automatic Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) LOCAL UNION NO. 20, re #9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time. (Gath, Neil)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4622-JRS-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:19-mc-0068-JRS-DML. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/20/2019. (BRR)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - The Court, on its own motion, vacates the initial pretrial conference set for 2:30 p.m. on February 11, 2020, and resets this conference for 9 a.m. on February 11, 2020, in Room 234, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. This is a time change only. All requirements in the order originally setting this conference shall remain in effect. [Filing No. 14.]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/18/2019.(MGG)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER- Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 2:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed CMP has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/18/2019.(CBU)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-04622-JRS-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Judge James R. Sweeney II for all further proceedings. This case is related to 1:19-mc-68-JRS-DML. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/10/2019. (MRI)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Daugherty on behalf of Defendant ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.. (Daugherty, Charles)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND FILING, filed by Defendant ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate) (Tate, Brandon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.. (Tate, Brandon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Eric Tate on behalf of Defendant ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.. (Tate, Brandon)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Exhibit 3 to #1 Complaint - LJAB Award, filed by Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20. (Gath, Neil) Modified on 11/21/2019 (JDH).
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC. (REO)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon R. Magner on behalf of Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20. (Magner, Brandon)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil E. Gath on behalf of Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20. (Gath, Neil)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enforce Local Joint Adjustment Board Award against Rogers Mechanical, Inc., filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5732551) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Project Stipulation Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Standard Form Union Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Gath, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) LOCAL UNION NO. 20 v. ROGERS MECHANICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Eric Tate
Represented By: Charles B. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (SMART) Local Union No. 20
Represented By: Brandon R. Magner
Represented By: Neil E. Gath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?