HARTSOCK v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HARTSOCK
Defendant: THELMA NORNES, JENNIFER FRENCH, GLEN THOMPSON, T. THOMPSON, N. RUCKER, DAVID FREEMAN, AMIE WILLIAMS, PETTY, DUNCAN, GEO GROUP, INC., SCOTT FITCH, KEITH BUTTS and ROY DAVIS
Case Number: 1:2019cv04639
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 Submission of documentation re: filing fee, filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH HARTSOCK. (JDC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH HARTSOCK. (JDC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION For Status of Filing Fee Payment and Notice of Change of Address, filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH HARTSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address for JOSEPH HARTSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by JOSEPH HARTSOCK located at WESTVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by JOSEPH HARTSOCK to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JDC)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLOSED JUDGMENT. FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Order directing the entry of final judgment, now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. This action is dismissed. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/9/2020. (JDC)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Dismissing Action and Directing Entry of Final Judgment - For the reasons explained in the Order of December 10, 2019, Mr. Hartsock is not eligible for in forma pauperis status, and he has not paid the filing fee as directed. Dkt. 5. Accordingly, for failure to prosecute, failure to pay the filing fee, and failure to comply with the Courts Order, this action is dismissed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Final judgment consistent with this Order shall now enter. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/9/2020. (JDC)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by JOSEPH HARTSOCK located at WESTVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by JOSEPH HARTSOCK to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JDC)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. and Directing Payment of Filing Fee. Mr. Hartsock shall have through January 2, 2020, in which to pay the $400 filing fee to the clerk of the district court. The failure to timely pay the filing fee shall result in the dismissal of this action and entry of final judgment without further notice. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/10/2019. (MAC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JOSEPH HARTSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Inmate Trust Fund Account; IDOC Transaction History Report). (AKH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #2 Envelope) (AKH).
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEITH BUTTS, ROY DAVIS, DUNCAN, SCOTT FITCH, DAVID FREEMAN, JENNIFER FRENCH, GEO GROUP, INC., THELMA NORNES, PETTY, N. RUCKER, GLEN THOMPSON, T. THOMPSON, AMIE WILLIAMS, filed by JOSEPH HARTSOCK. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Envelope).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARTSOCK v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HARTSOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THELMA NORNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER FRENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLEN THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. RUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMIE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT FITCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?