BENDER v. AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION et al
Plaintiff: Sara Bender
Defendant: Avon Community School Corporation and Avon Education Foundation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04694
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by AVON COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION.(Borg, Brent)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION. (Kolisek, Jake)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION. (LAB) (JRB)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake Kolisek on behalf of Defendant AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION. (Kolisek, Jake)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Eugene Stutzman on behalf of Defendant AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION. (Stutzman, Dana)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AVON COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Borg, Brent)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Borg on behalf of Defendant AVON COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Borg, Brent)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AVON COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION. (JRB)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Waterfill on behalf of Plaintiff Sara Bender. (Waterfill, Mark)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5741380) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Waterfill, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENDER v. AVON EDUCATION FOUNDATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Bender
Represented By: Mark R. Waterfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Community School Corporation
Represented By: Brent R. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Education Foundation
Represented By: Jake Kolisek
Represented By: Dana Eugene Stutzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?