JOHNSON v. ADESA
Plaintiff: ROBERT W. JOHNSON
Defendant: ADESA
Case Number: 1:2019cv04754
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED ON APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Because there is no objectively reasonable argument that Mr. Johnsons proposed appeal has merit at this point in his case, this appeal is not taken in good faith, and the motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, dkt. #9 , is DENIED (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION) (USCA #19-3513). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/14/2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT W. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(LBT)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 19-3513 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by ROBERT W. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice)(RSF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #5 Notice of Appeal. - for Court of Appeals Use Only. (RSF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re #5 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys/Parties attached. Copy to appellant via US Mail. (RSF) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/26/2019) (RSF).
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT W. JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT - Mr. Johnson shall have through January 10, 2020 to file an amended complaint that addresses the issues identified in this order and sets forth a basis for this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction. In doing so, he must clearly show (1) the federal law giving rise to his claims, (2) that the parties are of diverse citizenship, or (3) another basis for the Court's jurisdiction. If Mr. Johnson does not respond, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (See Order). Copy to Robert W. Johnson via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/09/2019.(JDH)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT W. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADESA, filed by ROBERT W. JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. ADESA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT W. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADESA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?