NEUROPTICS, INC. v. BRIGHTLAMP, INC.
Plaintiff: NEUROPTICS, INC.
Defendant: BRIGHTLAMP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04832
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/23/2020.(SWM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/23/2020. (SWM) (Main Document 17 replaced on 1/23/2020) (JD).
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint , filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to file Answer)(Hedges, Norman)
December 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Complaint, filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (Hedges, Norman)
December 22, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRIGHTLAMP, INC.. (Hedges, Norman)
December 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Counsel Norman J. Hedges, filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (Hedges, Norman) Modified on 12/23/2019 (JDH).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joey K. Liu for NEUROPTICS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Joey K. Liu register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Joey K. Liu via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019. (SWM)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Nathaniel L. Dilger for NEUROPTICS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Nathaniel L. Dilger register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Nathaniel L. Dilger via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019. (SWM)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 12/06/2019) (JDH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (REO)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joey K. Liu to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5756743), filed by Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hidde, Kandi)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nathaniel L. Dilger to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5756728), filed by Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hidde, Kandi)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Hidde, Kandi)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenai M. Brackett on behalf of Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Brackett, Jenai)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kandi Kilkelly Hidde on behalf of Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Hidde, Kandi)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIGHTLAMP, INC., filed by NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756682) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hidde, Kandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEUROPTICS, INC. v. BRIGHTLAMP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEUROPTICS, INC.
Represented By: Jenai M. Brackett
Represented By: Kandi Kilkelly Hidde
Represented By: Joey K. Liu
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Dilger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIGHTLAMP, INC.
Represented By: Norman J. Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?