CONVERSE et al v. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: RODERICK CONVERSE and PATRICIA GRUESSER
Defendant: US BANK NA, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI, LLC and US BANK N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04872
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE set for March 2, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. (EST), is hereby RESCHEDULED for MARCH 2, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. Please note that this is a time change ONLY. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/4/2020.(JRB)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time - Defendant, U.S. BANK,N.A., as Trustee for RAMP 2006EFC2, shall have up to and including February 26, 2020, in which to file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/24/2020. (JRB)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time - Defendant, PHHMORTGAGE CORPORATION, shall have up to and including March 2, 2020, in which to file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/24/2020. (JRB)
January 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 2, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trail, filed by Defendant PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Fisher, Jennifer)
January 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 26, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trail, filed by Defendant US BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Fisher, Jennifer)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiffs, Roderick Converse and Patricia Gruesser, by counsel, have moved this court to dismiss Defendants, Manley Deas Kochalski, LLC, and Equifax Information Services, LLC from this cause. The Court, being duly informed and finding said Motion made for good cause, now GRANTS said Motion. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED by this Court that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants, Manley Deas Kochalski, LLC, and Equifax Information Services, LLC are dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/16/2020. (CKM)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs RODERICK CONVERSE, PATRICIA GRUESSER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohron, Travis)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/9/2020.(JRB)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI, LLC. (Richardson, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI, LLC. (Richardson, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Richardson on behalf of Defendant MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI, LLC. (Richardson, Matthew)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant US BANK N.A.. (Fisher, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Fisher, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US BANK N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. BANCORP for US BANK N.A... (Fisher, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION for PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION.. (Fisher, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Fisher on behalf of Defendants PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, US BANK N.A.. (Fisher, Jennifer)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Saper on behalf of Defendants PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, US BANK N.A.. (Saper, Adam)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND OF RELATED FILING, filed by Plaintiffs RODERICK CONVERSE, PATRICIA GRUESSER (Cohron, Travis)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI, LLC, PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, US BANK N.A. (REO)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas H. Wooten on behalf of Plaintiffs RODERICK CONVERSE, PATRICIA GRUESSER. (Wooten, Nicholas)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rusty A. Payton on behalf of Plaintiffs RODERICK CONVERSE, PATRICIA GRUESSER. (Payton, Rusty)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Plaintiffs RODERICK CONVERSE, PATRICIA GRUESSER. (Cohron, Travis)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5761624) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - FC Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Agreed Judgment, #5 Exhibit C- March 12 2015 Payoff Quote, #6 Exhibit D - Aug 21 2015 Payoff Quote, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Relief from Stay, #8 Exhibit F - Mtn to Amend 1.29.10 Judgment Entry NPT, #9 Exhibit G - Emergency Mtn for Hearing, #10 Exhibit H - Gruesser RFP, #11 Exhibit I - Resp to Motion for Entry of PO, #12 Exhibit J - Motion to Partially Strike, #13 Exhibit K- Supp Resp to Motion for Entry of PO, #14 Exhibit L - Escrow Refund Check 692017, #15 Exhibit M - Motion for Partial Satisfaction of Judgment, #16 Exhibit N - Affidavit of Amount Due, #17 Exhibit O - Detail Transaction History, #18 Exhibit P - 2019-2-13 RFI No 1, #19 Exhibit Q - Cover letter RE RFI No 1 Resp from Ocwen, #20 Exhibit R - 2019-3-6 RFI No 2, #21 Exhibit S - 2019-9-16 RFI No 3, #22 Exhibit T - 2019-3-6 NOE No 1, #23 Exhibit U - 2019-8-7 NOE 2 to Ocwen, #24 Exhibit V - 2019-8-16 NOE No 2 Ack Letter, #25 Exhibit W - 2019-8-21 Resp to NOE No 2, #26 Exhibit X - 2019-10-2 NOE No 2 Resp, #27 Exhibit Y - 2019-9-4 NOE 3 to Ocwen, #28 Exhibit Z - 2019-10-16 NOE No 3 Resp, #29 Exhibit AA - Note and Mtg)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONVERSE et al v. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK CONVERSE
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Represented By: Nicholas H. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA GRUESSER
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Represented By: Rusty A. Payton
Represented By: Nicholas H. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Fisher
Represented By: Adam L. Saper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANLEY DEAS KOCHALSKI, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Fisher
Represented By: Adam L. Saper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?