ROACH v. KNIGHT
Petitioner: RUSSELL W. ROACH
Respondent: STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2019cv05020
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #3 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary), filed by STANLEY KNIGHT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conduct Report, #2 Exhibit B - Screening Report, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Lay Advocate Form, #4 Exhibit B-2 - Continuance Form, #5 Exhibit B-3 - Continuance Form, #6 Exhibit C - Hearing Report, #7 Exhibit D - Facility Appeal, #8 Exhibit E - DOC Appeal, #9 Exhibit F - List of Offenses, June 4, 2018, #10 Exhibit G - OIS Report, #11 Exhibit H - Declaration of Jennifer Farmer, #12 Exhibit I - Roach's Motion for Credit Time, #13 Exhibit J- Sup. Ct. Decision, #14 Exhibit K - IDOC Policy and Procedure, Credit Time, #15 Exhibit L - email attached to conduct report)(Talbot, Monika)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Dkts. #2 and #3 resent to Russell W. Roach at current address on docket, Miami Correctional Facility. (JRT)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as undeliverable -RTS/UNABLE TO FORWARD. #2 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to RUSSELL W. ROACH - 954613 PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY Inmate Mail/Parcels 727 MOON RD, PLAINFIELD IN 46168. (DWH)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Monika P. Talbot on behalf of Respondent STANLEY KNIGHT. (Talbot, Monika)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/UNABLE TO FORWARD. #3 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary) sent to RUSSELL W. ROACH - 954613 PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY Inmate Mail/Parcels 727 MOON RD, PLAINFIELD IN 46168. (DWH) Modified on 1/9/2020 (DWH).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE - Petitioner Russell W. Roachs January 2, 2020, motion for a change of venue, dkt. #4 , is denied. The clerk has updated the docket with Mr. Roachs new address, but a partys change of address is not a reason to change the venue of the action. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (allowing change of venue to a district where the action could have initially been brought). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/7/2020. Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. (DWH)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Change of Venue and Notice of Change of Address, filed by Petitioner RUSSELL W. ROACH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause - Discipline Case - Indiana Department of Correction inmate Russell W. Roach's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in prison case number IRO 18-06-0004 on August 7, 2018. The petitioner's custodian is directed to answer the allegations of the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted insofar as the petitioner challenges the deprivation of a recognized liberty interest affecting the fact or the duration of his confinement. This shall be done within forty-two (42) days of the date this Entry is signed. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) days after service of such answer or return to order to show cause on him in which to reply. (See Order). Copy to Russell W. Roach via U.S. mail. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/27/2019.(JDH)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RUSSELL W. ROACH. (Filing fee $5, receipt number IP067748) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Letter from L. Schneider, #3 Envelope)(AKH) Modified on 12/26/2019 (AKH). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/26/2019) (AKH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROACH v. KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STANLEY KNIGHT
Represented By: Monika P. Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RUSSELL W. ROACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?