ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Martin
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00214
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hyslop, Chelsea)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hyslop, Chelsea)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Schiferl, Kevin)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against FCA US LLC, filed by ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN.(Faultless, Scott)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint by February 12, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/30/2020.(JDH)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN.(Faultless, Scott)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by February 10, 2020, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Courts diversity jurisdiction. Defendant need not answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint at which this Order is directed. Defendant is cautioned, however, that when it does respond to the Amended Complaint, and to the extent that it denies any of Plaintiffs jurisdictional allegations or states that it does not have sufficient information to respond to those allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/27/2020.(JDH)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (REO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Barry on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Barry, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Anthony Faultless on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Faultless, Scott)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Craig, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Craig on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy Martin. (Craig, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Timothy Martin. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5816753) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Craig, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF AMY MARTIN v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Martin
Represented By: David W. Craig
Represented By: Scott Anthony Faultless
Represented By: Christopher M. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?