YOUNG v. SEVIER et al
Plaintiff: DAVID YOUNG
Defendant: MARK SEVIER, NCCF and GEO GROUP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00625
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The Court construes the plaintiff's submission on March 18, 2020, as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis because it includes his prison trust account statement. The motion, dkt. #6 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Two Dollars and Twenty-Five Cents ($2.25). The plaintiff shall have through April 24, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/20/2020. (NAD)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DAVID YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transaction History Inquiry, #2 Envelope)(NAD)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 Submission of Statement of Claims, filed by Plaintiff DAVID YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through March 27, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEO GROUP, NCCF, MARK SEVIER, filed by DAVID YOUNG. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. SEVIER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK SEVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCCF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?