DYE v. SAUL
Plaintiff: KELLY MARIE DYE
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00766
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/10/2020 , filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Order, #2 Appendix declaration)(Tate, Christie)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie O'Brien Tate on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Tate, Christie)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Motion to Withdraw Docket Entry Number 7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/9/2020. (SWM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw #7 Notice of Appearance , filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Julian)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 *** WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 4/9/2020 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian) Modified on 4/10/2020 (SWM).
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY - Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Filing No. #2 , is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/13/2020. (CKM)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
March 11, 2020 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Local Rule 5-12(a), and by agreement with the United States Attorney, no actual service of initial process is required in Social Security appeals brought in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, unless otherwise ordered. The Social Security Administration will treat notification through the Court's Case Management and Electronic Filing System (CM/ECF) as service under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therefore, the Clerk's Office will refrain from issuance of the submitted summons(es) unless otherwise ordered. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (AKH)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Little on behalf of Plaintiff KELLY MARIE DYE. (Little, C.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff KELLY MARIE DYE. (Little, C.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Disability Benefits against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by KELLY MARIE DYE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons United States Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Proposed Summons Assistant U.S. Attorney)(Little, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DYE v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Represented By: Christie O'Brien Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY MARIE DYE
Represented By: C. David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?