WHITE v. YANG ACUPUNCTURE et al
Plaintiff: BRENDA L. WHITE
Defendant: WEI YANG and YANG ACUPUNCTURE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00813
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have through May 4, 2020 to file an amended complaint or other-wise show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. In doing so, Plaintiff must clearly identify the citizenship of herself, Defendant Wei Yang, and Defendant Yang Acupuncture. Failure to do so in the time allotted will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. ****SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION**** (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail). Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 3/30/2020. (JDC)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WEI YANG, YANG ACUPUNCTURE, filed by BRENDA L. WHITE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. YANG ACUPUNCTURE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA L. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEI YANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANG ACUPUNCTURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?