STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00843
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/27/2020. (JRB)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically , filed by Plaintiff STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moyer, Kevin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (DJH)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Moyer on behalf of Plaintiff STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5908029) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Moyer, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kevin L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?