WRIGHT v. RDX SPORTS LLC
Plaintiff: DEMIELI WRIGHT and RDX SPORTS LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01029
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chelsey Chapman on May 26, 2020, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Noah)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Cartwright Thomas on behalf of Plaintiff DEMIELI WRIGHT. (Thomas, Noah)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RDX SPORTS LLC. (REO)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Cartwright Thomas on behalf of Plaintiff DEMIELI WRIGHT. (Thomas, Noah)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RDX SPORTS LLC, filed by DEMIELI WRIGHT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5937254) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Thomas, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. RDX SPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMIELI WRIGHT
Represented By: Noah Cartwright Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RDX SPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?