LEITZMAN v. U.S.BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: CODY LEITZMAN
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01055
Filed: April 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 SUBMISSION of Proposed Order Granting U.S. Bank's Motion to Withdraw its Motion to Bifurcate Discovery, filed by Defendant U.S. BANK, N.A., re #14 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery . (O'Conner, Nicholas) Modified on 6/2/2020 (CKM).
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery , filed by Defendant U.S. BANK, N.A.. (O'Conner, Nicholas)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff CODY LEITZMAN . (Marco, David)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. BANCORP for U.S. BANK, N.A... (O'Conner, Nicholas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by U.S. BANK, N.A..(O'Conner, Nicholas)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery, filed by Defendant U.S. BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Conner, Nicholas)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/5/2020.(SWM)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant U.S. BANK, N.A.. (O'Conner, Nicholas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas David O'Conner on behalf of Defendant U.S. BANK, N.A.. (O'Conner, Nicholas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. BANK, N.A. (REO)
April 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Paul Smith on behalf of Plaintiff CODY LEITZMAN. (Smith, Larry)
April 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Marco on behalf of Plaintiff CODY LEITZMAN. (Marco, David)
April 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against US BANK, NA, filed by CODY LEITZMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5940379) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEITZMAN v. U.S.BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CODY LEITZMAN
Represented By: Larry Paul Smith
Represented By: David M. Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Nicholas David O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?