MAPES v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Plaintiff: ERIC J. MAPES
Defendant: AMY M. JONES, RYAN WILSON MEARS, CALE J. BRADFORD, STATE OF INDIANA, CURTIS THELOPOLIS HILL and LORETTA H. RUSH
Case Number: 1:2020cv01071
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Courts Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT and DISMISSES Plaintiffs Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/1/2020. Copy Mailed (CKM)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Court issued an Order dismissing Plaintiff's case without prejudice and directing that if Plaintiff failed to file a new complaint within 30 days of its Order, he would lose his lawsuit for good. Plaintiff neither filed a new complaint by the Court's deadline nor sought an extension of that deadline. Therefore, because the Court is precluded from exercising jurisdiction, the Defendants are immune from suit, and the Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, final judgment will now issue DISMISSING THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/1/2020. Copy Mailed.(CKM)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis Dkt. #3 is GRANTED. The Court is precluded from exercising jurisdiction in this case. In addition, the Defendants are immune from suit and Plaintiffs Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED for these reasons. This dismissal is without prejudice, meaning that Plaintiff may file a new complaint addressing the issues set forth in this Order. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint WITHIN THIRTY DAYS of the date of this Order or he will lose his lawsuit for good. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/27/2020. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Rejection of Service from the Indiana Supreme Court, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES (CKM)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (REO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Plaintiff ERIC J. MAPES. (REO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CALE J. BRADFORD, CURTIS THELOPOLIS HILL, AMY M. JONES, RYAN WILSON MEARS, LORETTA H. RUSH, STATE OF INDIANA, filed by ERIC J. MAPES. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Indiana Supreme Court Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAPES v. STATE OF INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY M. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN WILSON MEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALE J. BRADFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS THELOPOLIS HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA H. RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC J. MAPES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?