KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC v. RSM INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Plaintiff: KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: PUSHPINDER SINGH, YORK SINGH, RAGHBIR SINGH, YORK MULTANI and RSM INVESTMENTS LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01077
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal dated 05/04/2020) (JDH)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLOSED DISMISSED - ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This matter comes before the Court on the Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff KS Equity Company, LLC ("KS") pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Court being duly advised hereby dismisses KS's Complaint without prejudice #9 . Copy to distribution list via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/4/2020.(JDH)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moore, John)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 04/07/2020, #2 Exhibit A - Leo's Market Trademark, #3 Exhibit B - Leo's Lion Head Trademark, #4 Exhibit C - Wake Up and Roar Trademark, #5 Exhibit D - Get Your Paws On This Trademark, #6 Exhibit E - Leo's Store Photographs, #7 Exhibit F - Leon's Store Photographs) (JDH)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to YORK MULTANI, RSM INVESTMENTS LLC, PUSHPINDER SINGH, RAGHBIR SINGH, YORK SINGH. (AKH)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Tuohy on behalf of Plaintiff KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC. (Tuohy, Brian)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC. (Moore, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC. (Moore, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5944560) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Leo's Market Trademark, #2 Exhibit B-Leo's Lion Head Trademark, #3 Exhibit C-Wake Up and Roar Trademark, #4 Exhibit D-Get Your Paws On This Trademark, #5 Exhibit E-Leo's Store Photographs, #6 Exhibit F-Leon's Store Photographs, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Moore, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC v. RSM INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUSHPINDER SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAGHBIR SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK MULTANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS EQUITY COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: John J. Moore
Represented By: Brian J. Tuohy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?