TRIPP et al v. CAMPFIELD et al
Plaintiff: GERALD D. PARKER, STEVEN A. CAMPFIELD, JUSTIN C. SHAUSE and TERRY W. TRIPP, SR.
Defendant: COMMISSIONER and STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01101
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff STEVEN A. CAMPFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Notice of Deficiency sent to JUSTIN C. SHAUSE 214523 PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 727 Moon Rd. Plainfield, IN 46168. Return to sender - not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (TMC) Modified on 5/26/2020 - Plaintiff JUSTIN C. SHAUSE released Community Transition Program per IDOC website (TMC).
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Notice and CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TERRY W. TRIPP, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through May 29, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (JRT)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copies distributed to Plaintiff's via US mail. (TMC)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER, STANLEY KNIGHT, filed by TERRY W. TRIPP, SR, STEVEN A. CAMPFIELD, JUSTIN C. SHAUSE, GERALD D. PARKER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIPP et al v. CAMPFIELD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD D. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN A. CAMPFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN C. SHAUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY W. TRIPP, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?