DAVIS v. WILLIAMS et al
Plaintiff: TRACY JEAN DAVIS
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS, STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC. and KOCH COMPANIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01227
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff TRACY JEAN DAVIS. (Hall-Justice, Susannah)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Defendants removed this action to this Court on April 22, 2020, alleging that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. [Filing No. 1.] Local Rule 81-1 provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. Although more than 30 days have passed since the filing of the Notice of Removal, Plaintiff has not filed a response as required by Local Rule 81-1. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by June 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/26/2020.(JDH)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on July 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/29/2020.(AAS)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KOCH COMPANIES, INC., STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC.. (Pokrywka, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tippecanoe County Circuit Court 1, case number 79D01-2003-CT-000051, filed by STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC., KOCH COMPANIES, INC., CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5964447) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tippecanoe Court Docket-Appearance-Complaint-Summons-Proof of Service-Answer-Appearance, #2 Exhibit Tippecanoe County Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Pokrywka, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. WILLIAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS
Represented By: Brian Joseph Pokrywka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: Brian Joseph Pokrywka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOCH COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Brian Joseph Pokrywka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY JEAN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?