PULLINS v. INDIANAPOLIS STAR INC. et al
Plaintiff: PIERRE Q. PULLINS
Defendant: GANNETT INC. and INDIANAPOLIS STAR INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01312
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint to 7/9/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/19/2020. (JRB) (copy sent via US Mail to plaintiff) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (TMB).
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff PIERRE Q. PULLINS. (DWH)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Mr. Pullins shall have through June 15, 2020 to file an amended complaint or otherwise show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. In doing so, he must clearly show (1) the federal law giving rise to his claims, (2) that the parties are of diverse citizenship, or (3) another basis for the Court's jurisdiction. If Mr. Pullins does not respond, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/15/2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GANNETT INC., INDIANAPOLIS STAR INC., filed by PIERRE Q. PULLINS. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PULLINS v. INDIANAPOLIS STAR INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANNETT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS STAR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRE Q. PULLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?