BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. SARAN TRUCKING INC. et al
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. and HARRIS N.A.
Defendant: BALJIT SARAN, PRITPAL SARAN and SARAN TRUCKING INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01555
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Saran Trucking Inc., Baljit Saran and Pritpal Saran, filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - BHB's Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment, #3 Non-Military Affidavit as to Baljit Saran, #4 Non-Military Affidavit as to Pritpal Saran, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Haney, James)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Plaintiff has moved for an entry of default against Defendants Saran Trucking Inc., Baljit Saran and Pritpal Saran, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and has submitted an affidavit in support thereof. Accordingly, default is hereby entered on this 27th day of July, 2020, against Defendants Saran Trucking Inc., Baljit Saran and Pritpal Saran for failure to plead or otherwise defend in this action. Signed by Clerk, Roger A.G. Sharpe. Copies via US Mail per distribution list (NAD)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. re #9 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default (Haney, James)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Entry of Default, #2 Non-Military Affidavit as to Baljit Saran, #3 Non-Military Affidavit as to Pritpal Saran, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Haney, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. SARAN TRUCKING INC. served on 6/4/2020. (Haney, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. PRITPAL SARAN served on 6/4/2020. (Haney, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. BALJIT SARAN served on 6/4/2020. (Haney, James)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Haney on behalf of Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Haney, James)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BALJIT SARAN, PRITPAL SARAN, SARAN TRUCKING INC. (REO)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO FINANCIAL CORP. for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A... (Haney, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BALJIT SARAN, PRITPAL SARAN, SARAN TRUCKING INC., filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6012867) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement 1, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement 2, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement 3, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement 4, #5 Exhibit E - Agreement 5, #6 Exhibit F - Pritpal Guaranties, #7 Exhibit G - Baljit Guaranties, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Haney, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. SARAN TRUCKING INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALJIT SARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRITPAL SARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAN TRUCKING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRIS N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?