TORLINE v. SPEEDWAY, LLC
Plaintiff: MARK TORLINE
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01571
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for July 30, 2020 to August 6, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/27/2020.(SWM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81-1, re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff MARK TORLINE. (Schultz, Frederick)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/10/2020.(CBU)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC . (Davis, Thomas)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 3:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/11/2020.(CBU)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick William Schultz on behalf of Plaintiff MARK TORLINE. (Schultz, Frederick)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE - The parties have indicated their consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge at Docket No. #6 . It is, therefore, ORDERED that this case be referred to the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge, The Honorable Doris L. Pryor, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. The cause number of this action shall be amended as shown above to reflect the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/8/2020.(NAD)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record : State Court Docket Sheet; Complaint; Appearance - Fred Schultz; Summons; Certified Green Card; Notice of Perfection of Service; E-filing Appearance - Thomas L. Davis; Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MPC INVESTMENT LLC for SPEEDWAY, LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Davis on behalf of Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Morgan County Superior Court, case number 55D02-2002-CT-000348, filed by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6017750) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 State Court Record : State Court Docket Sheet; Complaint; Appearance - Fred Schultz; Summons; Certified Green Card; Notice of Perfection of Service; E-filing Appearance - Thomas L. Davis; Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TORLINE v. SPEEDWAY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK TORLINE
Represented By: Frederick William Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?