MHG HOTELS, LLC, ET.AL., v. EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: MHG HOTELS, LLC, ET.AL.,, HOTELS OF DEERFIELD BEACH, LLC, EMERALD HOTELS INVESTMENTS, LLC, MOTELS OF NORTH AURORA, LLP, GOURLEY PIKE LODGING, LLC, SIVA, INC., MOTELS OF SEYMOUR, LLP, APPLETREE HOSPITALITY, LLC, HIREN, LLP, MOTELS OF SUGARLAND, LLP, HOTELS OF SPEEDWAY, LLC, NATVER, LLP, JALI, LLC, MOTELS OF BLOOMINGTON, LLC, HOTELS OF STAFFORD, LLP, MOTELS OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLP, RAVI, LLC, MOTELS OF FISCHERS, LLP, IDM, LLC, NEAL LODGING, LLC, MOTELS OF AVON, LLP, HOTELS OF DEERFIELD, LLC, MOTELS OF NOBLESVILLE 2, LLP, MOTELS OF NOBLESVILLE, LLC, SRI-RAM, INC. and RANJAN, LLC
Defendant: EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC and UNION INSURANCE COMPANY OF PROVIDENCE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01620
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lehmann, Andrew)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/22/2020.(SWM)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to 7/24/2020 to file an Amended Complaint. Defendant is granted until 8/14/2020 to file a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/6/2020. (CBU)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/14/2020 for Extension of Deadlines, filed by Defendant EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on the Parties Agreed Motion for Extension of Deadlines)(Curtis, Justin)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant EMC Risk Services LLC's #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/17/2020. (SWM)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (RAGS) (JRB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/6/2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Curtis, Justin)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick L. Hammond on behalf of Defendant EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (Hammond, Rick)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eman Senteno on behalf of Defendant EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (Senteno, Eman)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin K. Curtis on behalf of Defendant EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (Curtis, Justin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from marion county, case number 49D06-2005-CT-015059, filed by EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6029343) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index for Exhibits for Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record Complaint, Appearances, Summons, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order granting Motion for Enlargement of Time, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F(a), #11 Exhibit Exhibit F(b), #12 Exhibit Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit Exhibit L(a), #19 Exhibit Exhibit M, #20 Exhibit Exhibit N, #21 Exhibit Exhibit O, #22 Exhibit Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #24 Exhibit Exhibit R, #25 Exhibit Exhibit S, #26 Exhibit Exhibit T, #27 Exhibit Exhibit U, #28 Exhibit Exhibit V, #29 Exhibit Exhibit W, #30 Exhibit Exhibit X, #31 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #32 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #33 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #34 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #35 Exhibit Exhibit CC, #36 Exhibit Exhibit DD, #37 Exhibit Exhibit EE, #38 Exhibit Exhibit FF)(Curtis, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MHG HOTELS, LLC, ET.AL., v. EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHG HOTELS, LLC, ET.AL.,
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOTELS OF DEERFIELD BEACH, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERALD HOTELS INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF NORTH AURORA, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOURLEY PIKE LODGING, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIVA, INC.
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF SEYMOUR, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APPLETREE HOSPITALITY, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIREN, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF SUGARLAND, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOTELS OF SPEEDWAY, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATVER, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JALI, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF BLOOMINGTON, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOTELS OF STAFFORD, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVI, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF FISCHERS, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDM, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEAL LODGING, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF AVON, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOTELS OF DEERFIELD, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF NOBLESVILLE 2, LLP
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOTELS OF NOBLESVILLE, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRI-RAM, INC.
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANJAN, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC RISK SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Justin K. Curtis
Represented By: Eman Senteno
Represented By: Rick L. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION INSURANCE COMPANY OF PROVIDENCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?