DESERIO v. HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES LLC
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA DESERIO
Defendant: HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES LLC and HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01672
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Richards on behalf of Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Richards, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by CHRISTINA DESERIO. HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC served on 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Receipt)(Field, Kathleen)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on August 31, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis Time (EST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/10/2020. (AAS)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Heeb on behalf of Defendant HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (Heeb, Ryan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Kathleen E. Field hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Field, Kathleen)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC. (REO)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINA DESERIO. (Field, Kathleen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. Field on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTINA DESERIO. (Field, Kathleen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES LLC. (Field, Kathleen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES LLC, filed by CHRISTINA DESERIO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6041061) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Lease Renewal, #2 Exhibit B Second Lease Renewal)(Field, Kathleen) Modified on 6/22/2020 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESERIO v. HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER BLOOMINGTON PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Heeb
Represented By: John W. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA DESERIO
Represented By: Kathleen E. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?