AXIA HOLDINGS LLC v. PATTERSON et al
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC and AXIA HOLDINGS LLC
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, WILBERT J PATTERSON, JOHN DOE/MARY DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JESSIE R PATTERSON, JESSIE R. PATTERSON and WILBERT J. PATTERSON
Case Number: 1:2020cv01714
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting IN PART USA's #9 Motion to Vacate Initial Pretrial Conference and Related deadlines - The August 21, 2020 Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to September 18, 2020 at 11:30 A.M. No fewer than seven (7) days before the Conference, counsel must file a joint proposed case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/17/2020.(SWM)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate #8 Scheduling Order , filed by Defendants U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on August 21, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. (EST), before the Honorable Doris L. Pryor, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the Initial Pretrial Conference, counsel must file a Proposed Case Management Plan. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/31/2020. (GD)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Home Equity Conversion Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Assignment to Nationstar, #3 Exhibit 3 - Assignment to HUD, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certificate of Indebtednes, #5 Exhibit 5 - Home Equity Conversion Second Mortgage)(Shields, Gina)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Federal Defendants' #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/1/2020. (SWM)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 27, 2020 in which to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendants U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendants U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shields, Gina)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit Court, case number 49C01-2004-PL-014399, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record appearance, complaint, exhibits, praecipe, affidavit, notice of suit, summonses, return of service, proof of publication, #2 Complaint to Quiet Title Real Estate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXIA HOLDINGS LLC v. PATTERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBERT J PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE/MARY DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSIE R PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSIE R. PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBERT J. PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?