BIGOT v. ALDRICH
Plaintiff: EDWOOD BIGOT
Defendant: TRACEY ALRIDCH and TRACEY ALDRICH
Case Number: 1:2020cv01803
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY CLOSING CASE - On August 11, 2020, Edwood Bigot filed a "Motion to Dismiss" his complaint. The court DENIES this motion #6 for docketing purposes and instead construes it as a notice of dismissal. The clerk is therefore directed to close this case. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/12/2020.(JRB)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff EDWOOD BIGOT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DENYING MOTION FOR ASSISTANCE WITH RECRUITING COUNSEL, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Bigot's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2) is GRANTED. Bigot's Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel (Filing No. 3) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Bigot shall have through September 4, 2020 to explain why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The clerk is directed to change Defendant's name from "Alridch" to "Aldrich". SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/3/2020. (JRB)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, filed by Plaintiff EDWOOD BIGOT. (AKH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff EDWOOD BIGOT. (AKH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRACEY ALRIDCH, filed by EDWOOD BIGOT. (No fee paid with this filing) (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIGOT v. ALDRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY ALRIDCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY ALDRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWOOD BIGOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?