JONES v. MAYOR et al
Plaintiff: TED BELCHER JONES
Defendant: MAYOR, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, JON B KING, CHIEF, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, MAYOR, CHIEF and JON B. KING
Case Number: 1:2020cv01804
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2020 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/27/2020.(SWM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CHIEF, JON B. KING, MAYOR. (Willfond, Adam)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Scott Willfond on behalf of Defendants CHIEF, JON B. KING, MAYOR. (Willfond, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby Allen Potters on behalf of Plaintiff TED BELCHER JONES. (Potters, Bobby)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CHIEF, JON B. KING, MAYOR. (AKH)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by TED BELCHER JONES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6062228) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Mayor, City of Indianapolis, #3 Proposed Summons Chief, Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, #4 Proposed Summons Jon B. King, Individually)(Potters, Bobby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. MAYOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR, CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON B KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR
Represented By: Adam Scott Willfond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF
Represented By: Adam Scott Willfond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON B. KING
Represented By: Adam Scott Willfond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TED BELCHER JONES
Represented By: Bobby Allen Potters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?