DEBOARD v. SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID DEBOARD
Defendant: SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC and DAILY CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01810
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2020 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/27/2020.(SWM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Frasher on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID DEBOARD. (Frasher, Ryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC. (Beggs, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Beggs on behalf of Defendant SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC. (Beggs, William)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC and DAILY CONSTRUCTION, LLC. (AKH) Modified on 7/8/2020 (AKH).
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Calhoun on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID DEBOARD. (Calhoun, Eric)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DAVID DEBOARD. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6063810) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Calhoun, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEBOARD v. SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENTINEL INDIANA, LLC
Represented By: William J. Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAILY CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DEBOARD
Represented By: Eric G. Calhoun
Represented By: Ryan R. Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?