COMMON CAUSE INDIANA v. LAWSON et al
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA
Defendant: KEVIN C. SMITH, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT, PAUL RAUSCH, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, S. ANTHONY LONG, RANDALL VONDERHEIDE, CONNIE LAWSON, PAUL OKESON, J. BRADLEY KING, ANGELA NUSSMEYER and RAY ADLER
Case Number: 1:2020cv01825
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
September 1, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants (all members of Indiana county election boards and boards of elections and registration) , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
September 1, 2020 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Randall Vonderheide , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
August 31, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT.(Garn, Jefferson)
August 25, 2020 Filing 65 MARGINAL ENTRY re Defendants' #27 Motion for Status Conference to Set Briefing Schedule or for Extension of Time - Motion denied as moot; briefing schedule has been set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/25/2020. (SWM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Joinder in State Defendants' Response in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant PAUL RAUSCH, re #56 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Blevins, Sara)
August 21, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Joinder in State Defendants' Response in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant RAY ADLER, re #56 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Lowe, Anne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant RAndall Vonderheide's Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant KEVIN C. SMITH (Tolbert, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE Joinder in Defendant Randall Vonderheide's Response in Opposition to Motion for Certification, filed by Defendant KEVIN C. SMITH (Tolbert, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant, Randall Vonderheide's Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support, filed by Defendant KEVIN C. SMITH, re #50 Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Tolbert, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant Randall Vonderheide's Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant PAUL RAUSCH (Conrad, Monica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant Randall Vonderheide's Response in Opposition to Motion for Certification of Defendant Class, filed by Defendant PAUL RAUSCH (Conrad, Monica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant Randall Vonderheide's Motion to Dismiss & Memorandum in Support, filed by Defendant PAUL RAUSCH (Conrad, Monica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
August 21, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant Randall Vonderheides Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant RAY ADLER, re #52 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Lowe, Anne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE Joinder in Defendant Randall Vonderheides Response in Opposition to Motion for Certification of Defendant Class, filed by Defendant RAY ADLER, re #51 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Lowe, Anne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendant Vonderheid's Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support, filed by Defendant RAY ADLER, re #50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Randall Vonderheide. (Lowe, Anne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as to Randall Vonderheide, filed by Defendant RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (Masson, Douglas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants (all members of Indiana county election boards and boards of elections and registration) , filed by Defendant RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (Masson, Douglas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 50 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Randall Vonderheide , filed by Defendant RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (Masson, Douglas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Randall Vonderheide, filed by Defendant RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (Masson, Douglas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (Masson, Douglas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica J. Conrad on behalf of Defendant PAUL RAUSCH. (Conrad, Monica)
August 3, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
August 3, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RAY ADLER. (Riley, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PAUL RAUSCH. (Blevins, Sara)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Ryan Snow for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/29/2020. (SWM)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON JULY 27, 2020, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel July 27, 2020, for a telephonic status conference. Defendant Ray Adler's motion to join [Filing No. 28] is granted to the extent that Adler was permitted to participate in the July 27 status conference. The Court set the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendants shall file their responses to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and motion for class certification by August 21, 2020; and (2) Plaintiff shall file any reply briefs by September 1, 2020. Given the parties' request for the Court to issue a ruling in advance of the November 3, 2020 election, the Court does not anticipate enlarging this briefing schedule. Copies Mailed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bradley S. Phillips for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/29/2020. (SWM) Modified on 7/29/2020 (SWM).
July 28, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 8/31/2020 , filed by Defendant KEVIN C. SMITH. (Tolbert, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2020 (JRB).
July 28, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Blevins on behalf of Defendant PAUL RAUSCH. (Blevins, Sara)
July 24, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Tolbert on behalf of Defendant KEVIN C. SMITH. (Tolbert, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan Snow to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6097309), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Ryan Snow, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 24, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bradley S. Phillips to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6097300), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Bradley S. Phillips, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Aneel L. Chablani for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/24/2020 Copy of this Order sent to Attorney Chablani via US Mail (CBU)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Ami Gandhi for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/24/2020 Copy of Order sent to Attorney Gandhi via US Mail (CBU)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jennifer Terrell for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/24/2020 Copy of this order sent to Attorney Terrell via US Mail (CBU)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Ezra D. Rosenberg for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/24/2020 Copy of Order sent to Attorney Rosenberg via US Mail (CBU)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to set a briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/24/2020.(CBU)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/10/2020 or for status conference , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Join in State Defendants' Motion for Status Conference to Set Briefing Schedule or for Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RAY ADLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, William)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/10/2020 or for status conference, filed by Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ezra D. Rosenberg to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6093555), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Ezra D. Rosenberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer Terrell to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6093519), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Jennifer Terrell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ami Gandhi to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6093495), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Ami Gandhi, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Aneel L. Chablani to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6093473), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Aneel L. Chablani, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Joseph Masson on behalf of Defendant RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (Masson, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Lyn Abshire on behalf of Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Abshire, Courtney)
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt on behalf of Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Pratt, Aleksandrina)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Nijjar, Parvinder)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendants J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT. (Garn, Jefferson)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. RAY ADLER served on 7/14/2020; J. BRADLEY KING served on 7/14/2020; ZACHARY E. KLUTZ served on 7/14/2020; CONNIE LAWSON served on 7/13/2020; S. ANTHONY LONG served on 7/14/2020; ANGELA NUSSMEYER served on 7/14/2020; PAUL OKESON served on 7/14/2020; SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT served on 7/14/2020; PAUL RAUSCH served on 7/13/2020; KEVIN C. SMITH served on 7/13/2020; RANDALL VONDERHEIDE served on 7/14/2020. (Schweizer, Gregory)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Amended Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brent R. Austin for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/15/2020. (SWM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent R. Austin to Appear pro hac vice (Correction to ECF No. 9) (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Corrected Certification of Brent R. Austin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Medlin Lowe on behalf of Defendant RAY ADLER. (Lowe, Anne)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Riley on behalf of Defendant RAY ADLER. (Riley, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Riley on behalf of Defendant RAY ADLER. (Riley, William)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Sarah Kinter for COMMON CAUSE INDIANA added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Sarah Kinter via U.S. Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/13/2020. (MAC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah Kinter to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6069663), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Sarah Kinter, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent R. Austin to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6069634), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Brent R. Austin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to RAY ADLER, J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT, PAUL RAUSCH, KEVIN C. SMITH, RANDALL VONDERHEIDE. (JRB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants (all members of Indiana county election boards and boards of elections and registration) , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants (all members of Indiana county election boards and boards of elections and registration), filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Schweizer Declaration, #2 Schweizer Decl. Ex. A 11.6.2018 Article, 13 WTHR, #3 Schweizer Decl. Ex. B Complaint and Order, Case No. 41C01-1811-MI-000263, Johnson Cty., #4 Schweizer Decl. Ex. C 11.6.2018 Article, Times of Northwest Indiana, #5 Schweizer Decl. Ex. D Petition and Order, Case No. 64D01-1811-MI-10723, Porter Cty., #6 Schweizer Decl. Ex. E 11.6.2018 Article, Indiana Public Media, #7 Schweizer Decl. Ex. F 11.6.2018 Article, Indianapolis Star, #8 Schweizer Decl. Ex. G 2015 Report, Caltech/MIT Voting Technology Project, #9 Schweizer Decl. Ex. H 2017 Working Paper, #10 Schweizer Decl. Ex. I 2017 Article, Political Science Quarterly, #11 Schweizer Decl. Ex. J 9.4.2019 Article, Natl Bureau of Econ. Res., #12 Schweizer Decl. Ex. K 6.3.2020 Report, Brennan Center for Justice, #13 Schweizer Decl. Ex. L 2005 Article, State Politics & Policy Quarterly, #14 Schweizer Decl. Ex. M 2009 Article, State Politics & Policy Quarterly, #15 Schweizer Decl. Ex. N U.S. Census Bureau Data for Lake Cty., #16 Schweizer Decl. Ex. O U.S. Census Bureau Data for Porter Cty., #17 Schweizer Decl. Ex. P 3.20.2020 Article, ABC News & Associated Press, #18 Schweizer Decl. Ex. Q 5.15.2020 Article, Indianapolis Star, #19 Schweizer Decl. Ex. R 6.2.2020 Article, Indianapolis Star, #20 Schweizer Decl. Ex. S 3.14.2020 Article, Chicago Tribune, #21 Schweizer Decl. Ex. T 3.17.2020 Article, Block Club Chicago, #22 Schweizer Decl. Ex. U 3.17.2020 Article, NBC 5 Chicago, #23 Schweizer Decl. Ex. V 3.17.2020 Article, Chicago Sun Times, #24 Schweizer Decl. Ex. W 4.7.2020 Article, The New York Times, #25 Schweizer Decl. Ex. X 4.7.2020 Article, WBAY, #26 Schweizer Decl. Ex. Y 4.23.2020 Article, USA Today, #27 Schweizer Decl. Ex. Z 5.1.2020 Article, Bloomberg News, #28 Schweizer Decl. Ex. AA 4.29.2020 Article, CNN, #29 Schweizer Decl. Ex. BB 4.12.2020 Article, CNN, #30 Schweizer Decl. Ex. CC 5.7.2020 Article, WUSA, #31 Schweizer Decl. Ex. DD 5.12.2020 Tr. of Dr. Fauci Congressional Testimony, #32 Schweizer Decl. Ex. EE 7.1.2020 Article, Indianapolis Star, #33 Schweizer Decl. Ex. FF 7.2.2020 Article, Indianapolis Star, #34 Exhibit 2 Meredith Declaration, #35 Exhibit 3 Vaughn Affidavit)(Schweizer, Gregory)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Schweizer on behalf of Plaintiff COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Schweizer, Gregory)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAY ADLER, J. BRADLEY KING, ZACHARY E. KLUTZ, CONNIE LAWSON, S. ANTHONY LONG, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, PAUL OKESON, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT, PAUL RAUSCH, KEVIN C. SMITH, RANDALL VONDERHEIDE, filed by COMMON CAUSE INDIANA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6065587) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schweizer, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA v. LAWSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN C. SMITH
Represented By: Michael E. Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL RAUSCH
Represented By: Monica J. Conrad
Represented By: Sara R. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY E. KLUTZ
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. ANTHONY LONG
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL VONDERHEIDE
Represented By: Douglas Joseph Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL OKESON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BRADLEY KING
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA NUSSMEYER
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Represented By: Courtney Lyn Abshire
Represented By: Aleksandrina Penkova Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY ADLER
Represented By: William N. Riley
Represented By: Anne Medlin Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA
Represented By: Gregory M. Schweizer
Represented By: Aneel L. Chablani
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Sarah Kinter
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Jennifer Terrell
Represented By: Ami Gandhi
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Brent R. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?