WOODS-TYLER v. INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: Constance Woods-Tyler
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, John Doe 3, John Doe 2, Sergeant B. Garner, Officer J Steward, John Doe 1, JOHN DOE, 2, JOHN DOE, 3, B. GARNER, JOHN DOE, 1 and J. STEWARD
Case Number: 1:2020cv01884
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Habib, Daniyal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff CONSTANCE WOODS-TYLER . (Goodman, Ian)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/2020.(SWM)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants Indianapolis Metropolitan Police Department, J. Steward, and B. Garner's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/2020. (SWM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2020 for Answer to Complaint, filed by Defendants B. GARNER, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, J. STEWARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order GRANTING Belated MEOT)(Habib, Daniyal)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniyal M. Habib on behalf of Defendants B. GARNER, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, J. STEWARD. (Habib, Daniyal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CONSTANCE WOODS-TYLER.(Goodman, Ian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JOHN DOE, 2, JOHN DOE, 3, JOHN DOE, 1, B. GARNER, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, J. STEWARD. (REO)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Robert Lowry on behalf of Plaintiff Constance Woods-Tyler. (Lowry, Joshua)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Goodman on behalf of Plaintiff Constance Woods-Tyler. (Goodman, Ian)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6078836) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Goodman, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODS-TYLER v. INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Daniyal M. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant B. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, 2
Represented By: Daniyal M. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, 3
Represented By: Daniyal M. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. GARNER
Represented By: Daniyal M. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, 1
Represented By: Daniyal M. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. STEWARD
Represented By: Daniyal M. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Woods-Tyler
Represented By: Ian P. Goodman
Represented By: Joshua Robert Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?