NELSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: ANTOINE NELSON
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01891
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Respondent's motion for a ninety (90) day extension of time to respond to the Petitioner's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. The Court, being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS the motion, dkt. #4 , finding it to be made for good cause. The Respondent shall have to and including December 1, 2020, to file its response to the 2255 motion. Copy to Antoine Nelson via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/26/2020. (JDH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to December 1, 2020 in which to #2 Order to Show Cause , filed by Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Bradley)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Paul Shepard on behalf of Respondent UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shepard, Bradley)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 1. The clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for this District. The United States is notified of the filing of the petitioner's motion for relief and memorandum in support pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. 2. The United States shall have until August 31, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the motion for relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. 3. If the United States' answer refers to briefs, filings, or transcripts of the prior proceedings that are not available in the Court's electronic records, the United States is directed to furnish them along with its answer. See Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings. Any motion for an extension of time to file an answer should include a statement notifying the Court whether and when a request for production of transcripts has been made to the court reporter. 4. Any motion for an extension of time filed by the respondent must include the petitioner's current earliest possible release date. Copy to Antoine Nelson via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/20/2020.(JDH)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255)(1:18-cr-023-JPH-TAB-01) filed by ANTOINE NELSON. (Attachments: #1 letters from Indiana Federal Community Defender, court records)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley Paul Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTOINE NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?