CARTER v. OFFICE DEPOT, INC.
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CARTER
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT, INC. and OFFICE DEPOT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01899
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021. Discovery due by 5/7/2021. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/2/2020. (GD)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/2/2020. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 2:30 PM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 3/12/2021 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/2/2020.(SWM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff WILLIAM CARTER . (Etter, Ryan)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before August 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/12/2020. (MAC)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Jurisdictional Statement Supplemental, re #5 Entry by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ben Shrader)(Shrader, Benjamin) Modified on 8/4/2020 - deleted duplicative docket text(NAD).
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC..(Shrader, Benjamin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (JDH)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - It has come to the Court's attention that Defendant's Notice of Removal fails to allege all of the facts necessary to determine whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The Notice of Removal alleges that this Court has jurisdiction based upon diversity of citizenship. However, the Notice of Removal fails to sufficiently allege the citizenship of the parties. Citizenship is the operative consideration for jurisdictional purposes. Defendant is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of Plaintiff William Carter and clarify whether the Defendant is a corporation or limited liability company. If the Defendant is a limited liability company, then the jurisdictional statement should also identify the members of the limited liability company and those members' citizenship. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/20/2020. (JDC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Shrader, Benjamin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PENDING STATE COURT MOTIONS, filed by Defendant OFFICE DEPOT, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal. (Shrader, Benjamin)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Civil Division 2, case number 49D02-2006-CT-019635, filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6081571) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance by Plaintiff's Counsel, Subpoena/Summons, Return of Service, Appearance by Defendant's counsel, and Motion for Automatic Enlargement), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ben Shrader, #6 Exhibit D - Corporate Organization, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit F - State Court Record)(Shrader, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. OFFICE DEPOT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CARTER
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Etter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?