WATTERSON v. INDIANA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON
Defendant: INDIANA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS, J. JONES, I. RANDOLPH, LOTZ and STANLEY KNIGHT
Case Number: 1:2020cv01943
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee and Denying Motion to Waive or Reduce Filing Fee; Mr. Watterson's motion for an extension of time to pay the initial partial filing fee, dkt. #9 , is granted. Mr. Watterson shall have through September 28, 2020, to pay the $14.68 initial partial filing fee. Mr. Watterson's motion to reconsider the assessment of the filing fee, dkt. #10 , is denied. If Mr. Watterson's financial circumstances have changed, he may renew his motion with an updated copy of his trust account. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/26/2020. (CKM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JD)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Public Docket Sheet) (NAD)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON. (NAD)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON located at PLAINFIELD CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NAD)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Fourteen Dollars and Sixty-Eight Cents ($14.68). The plaintiff shall have through August 21, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/27/2020. (NAD)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Affidavit of Indigency; Offender Trust System Transaction History Inquiry, #2 Envelope).(AKH) Modified on 7/24/2020 (MAC).
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS, J. JONES, STANLEY KNIGHT, LOTZ, I. RANDOLPH, filed by ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Grievance; Grievance Appeal; IDOC Offender Grievance Response Report; IDOC Receipt - Administrative Remedy; Offender Grievance Response Report, #2 Envelope). (AKH) Modified on 7/24/2020 (MAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATTERSON v. INDIANA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. RANDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY LOUIS EMILE WATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?