ARMOGIDA v. CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMY ARMOGIDA
Defendant: JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC. and CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01986
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 10/7/2020 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/24/2020. (SWM)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 10/07/2020 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff AMY ARMOGIDA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehner, Meghan)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Regarding Protective Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/18/2020.(CBU)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/18/2020.(CBU)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2021. Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Settlement/status Conference set for 3/17/2021 at 1:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/18/2020.(CBU)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on September 14, 2020. The Court will approve the Case Management Plan, by separate order, with the changes to which the parties have agreed. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on December 14, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. This matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on March 17, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC., JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC. and Plaintiff AMY ARMOGIDA. (Hicks, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC..(Hicks, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Vlink, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Vlink, David)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Submission of Additional State Court Records for Marion County Cause 49D01-2006-PL-017752. no/env (CKM) Modified on 8/3/2020 (CKM).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/31/2020.(CAG)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC., JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Vlink, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Vlink, David)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Vlink on behalf of Defendant JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Vlink, David)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Hicks, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE , filed by Defendants CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC., JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hicks, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Adam Hicks on behalf of Defendants CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC., JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.. (Hicks, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, Civil Division 1, case number 49D01-2006-PL-17752, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6104308) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Ex. 1 (Appearance, Commercial Court Identifying Notice, Subpoena/Summons Filed, Subpoena/Summons Filed, Complaint, Service Returned Served, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement of Time), #2 Exhibit 2 (Operative Complaint), #3 Civil Cover Sheet for Removed Case)(Hicks, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARMOGIDA v. CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY ARMOGIDA
Represented By: Christopher Lawrence Cassidy
Represented By: Meghan Uzzi Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.
Represented By: David T. Vlink
Represented By: Robert Adam Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL INDIANA JOBS WITH JUSTICE, INC.
Represented By: Robert Adam Hicks
Represented By: David T. Vlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?