BAKER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: TAMMY L. BAKER
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv02049
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant is granted an enlargement of time, until December 5, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/1/2020. (NAD)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/5/20 to File Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer the Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed), filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Alesia, Brian) Modified on 10/1/2020 - edited docket text to match title of document(NAD).
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Alesia on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Alesia, Brian)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Elaine Wold on behalf of Plaintiff TAMMY L. BAKER. (Wold, Kirsten)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by TAMMY L. BAKER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6114135) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wold, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY L. BAKER
Represented By: Kirsten Elaine Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Represented By: Brian J. Alesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?