AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE/MARY DOE, AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, JERRY SMITH, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF THELMA LOUISE STRONG, THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF HOWARD E. STRONG, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, PAPA TANNY, LLC, UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF THELMA LOUISE STRONG, JOHN DOE/MARY DOE and UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF HOWARD E. STRONG
Case Number: 1:2020cv02050
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk of the Marion County Court acknowledges receipt of remand documents on 9/11/2020 re #9 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Marion County Court. (JDC) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Marion County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (JDC)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLOSED DISMISSED/CLOSED REMANDED - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT AND TO REMAND TO STATE COURT #7 - Plaintiff, Axia Holdings LLC, by counsel, having filed an Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendants The United States of America and The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, and Remand to State Court,AND THE COURT having considered said Motion and being otherwise duly advised in the premises, now finds that Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendants, The United States of America and The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development are hereby dismissed as a party and that this matter is remanded to state court for further disposition. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 9/4/2020. (JDC)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant, United States of America, Department of Housing and Urban Development, and To Remand To State Court)(Berkshire, Jynell)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Initial Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint - Defendants, the United States of America and the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development are afforded to and including September 4, 2020, to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/10/2020. (AAS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 4, 2020 in which to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendants UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendants UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shields, Gina)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit Court, case number 49C01-2005-PL-017112, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 state court docket, appearance, complaint, exhibits, publication praecipe and affidavit, summonses, affidavits of proof of service, affidavits of service, certificate of issuance of summons, #2 State Court Record Complaint to Quiet Title to Real Estate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE/MARY DOE, AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF THELMA LOUISE STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF HOWARD E. STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPA TANNY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF THELMA LOUISE STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE/MARY DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF HOWARD E. STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIA HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?